OK HB1669 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1669
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; authorizing use of cannabidiol for certain medical condition; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; authorizing use of cannabidiol for certain medical condition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Thomsen |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1669 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services