OK HB1648 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Waters and water rights; prohibiting the Board of Directors of the Grand River Dam Authority from raising rates and charges for raw water from a certain period; providing for the formation of a special committee. Emergency.
Title
Waters and water rights; prohibiting the Board of Directors of the Grand River Dam Authority from raising rates and charges for raw water from a certain period; providing for the formation of a special committee. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 10 | |
2009-03-10 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-10 | Amended | |
2009-03-10 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brogdon | |
2009-03-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Wilson (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Withdrawn from Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Rousselot, Blackwell | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 862 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 868 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 894 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |