OK HB1641 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1641
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; fees; modifying name of certain license; wine and spirits wholesaler license; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; fees; modifying name of certain license; wine and spirits wholesaler license; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Bice, Leewright, Pugh, Stanislawski, Brooks, Young |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1641 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference