OK HB1603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1603
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; changing percentage of legal voters from statewide to each county of the state for certain petitions; ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; changing percentage of legal voters from statewide to each county of the state for certain petitions; ballot title.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1603 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules