OK HB1598 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-25 - Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Counseling; creating the Parental and Family Rights in Counseling Protection Act; emergency.
Title
Counseling; creating the Parental and Family Rights in Counseling Protection Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Kern |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1925 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1925 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1925 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1925 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |