OK HB1550 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1550
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying certain definition; effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying certain definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Shortey; authored by Senator Fields |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2017-03-06 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 10 |
2017-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Coody, Bennett (John), Montgomery, Calvey, Gann |
2017-02-27 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1550 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017