OK HB1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1540
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; licensing and permitting; modifying acts authorized by hold of winemaker license; Direct Wine Consumer's Permit; modifying acts required or prohibited for holder of permit; effective dates.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; licensing and permitting; modifying acts authorized by hold of winemaker license; Direct Wine Consumer's Permit; modifying acts required or prohibited for holder of permit; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 10 |
2017-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Virgin |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1540 (Carry Over) 2017-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 2 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |