OK HB1518 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1518
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; creating the Emergency Information and Secure Schools Program (EISSP); providing technical and operational standards of the EISSP; codification; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; creating the Emergency Information and Secure Schools Program (EISSP); providing technical and operational standards of the EISSP; codification; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Motion expired |
2017-03-21 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cockroft |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 60 |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1518 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Motion expired