OK HB1503 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; motor vehicle liability policies; modifying minimum insurance coverage requirements; effective date.
Title
Insurance; motor vehicle liability policies; modifying minimum insurance coverage requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 35 |
2023-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Sneed |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1503 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee