OK HB1489 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Wind energy; relating to the Wind Energy Development Act; setback requirements; filing notice; private-use airports; disputes; emergency.
Title
Wind energy; relating to the Wind Energy Development Act; setback requirements; filing notice; private-use airports; disputes; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1489 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - Emergency added