OK HB1470 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; creating the Cost Reduction, Efficiency and Reform Act of 2013; effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Cost Reduction, Efficiency and Reform Act of 2013; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Jolley; authored by Senator David |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2013-03-07 | House | General Order |
2013-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 2 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 40 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 13 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 14 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 15 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5009 | 16 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |