OK HB1458 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Precious Metal and Gem Dealer Licensing Act; authorizing law enforcement to place hold order on certain property; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Precious Metal and Gem Dealer Licensing Act; authorizing law enforcement to place hold order on certain property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |