OK HB1450 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; adding person authorized to issue or deny certain permits under the Oklahoma Uniform Environmental Permitting Act; effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; adding person authorized to issue or deny certain permits under the Oklahoma Uniform Environmental Permitting Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Environmental Law Committee Meeting: U DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Environmental Law Committee Meeting: U DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 |
2015-02-12 | House | General Order |
2015-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Environmental Law Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Environmental Law |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |