OK HB1446 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; School District Empowerment Program; teacher evaluations; professional development; effective date; emergency.
Title
Teachers; School District Empowerment Program; teacher evaluations; professional development; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Waldron |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10 |
2023-03-22 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2023-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson |
2023-03-22 | House | General Order |
2023-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education