OK HB1438 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; establishing the Oklahoma State Government Asset Reduction and Cost Savings Program; effective date.
Title
State government; establishing the Oklahoma State Government Asset Reduction and Cost Savings Program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2011-04-19 | Title restored | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | First Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-09 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Emergency removed | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Shannon | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |