OK HB1413 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; release on personal recognizance; plea; fine; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; release on personal recognizance; plea; fine; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2017-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1413 (Carry Over) 2017-03-02 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee