OK HB1407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1407
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; permitting school district to offer construction education course to students in grade nine or above; effective date.
Title
Schools; permitting school district to offer construction education course to students in grade nine or above; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4 |
2017-02-28 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1407 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Education