OK HB1403 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Water; defining terms; directing Oklahoma Water Resources Board to determine instream flows for certain rivers; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water; defining terms; directing Oklahoma Water Resources Board to determine instream flows for certain rivers; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Boggs
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-14SenateRemove as author Senator Silk; authored by Senator Bullard
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 20
2019-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author)
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Humphrey
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback