OK HB1403 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Water; defining terms; directing Oklahoma Water Resources Board to determine instream flows for certain rivers; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.
Title
Water; defining terms; directing Oklahoma Water Resources Board to determine instream flows for certain rivers; authorizing promulgation of rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Silk; authored by Senator Bullard |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 20 |
2019-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1403 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Coauthored by Senator Boggs