OK HB1400 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Vision Act; revenues; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; Vision Act; revenues; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Montgomery |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1400 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee