OK HB1398 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing district attorneys to submit certain reports; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; directing district attorneys to submit certain reports; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |