OK HB1364 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; modifying requirements and procedures to conduct certain criminal background searches on persons with access to children in child care facilities; effective date.
Title
Children; modifying requirements and procedures to conduct certain criminal background searches on persons with access to children in child care facilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Amended | |
2011-03-17 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Peters | |
2011-03-03 | Remove Representative Peters as principal House author and substitute with Representative Shumate | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 402 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 404 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 405 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 405 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 408 | New Code | See Bill Text |