OK HB1341 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Court records; records of convictions; procedure for authorization to obtain certain information; development of an online registration and access portal; effective date.
Title
Court records; records of convictions; procedure for authorization to obtain certain information; development of an online registration and access portal; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2017-05-23 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Scott, Dahm, Fry, Holt, Newhouse, Floyd, Pittman |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-20 | House | Amended |
2017-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-20 | House | General Order |
2017-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2017-02-22 | House | Remove Representative Biggs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Worthen |
2017-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1341 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - Enacting clause restored