OK HB1299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; minimum mandatory sentences; adding certain offense; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; minimum mandatory sentences; adding certain offense; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1299 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Second Reading referred to Rules