OK HB1296 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1296
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; employment of attorneys by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; effective date.
Title
State government; employment of attorneys by the Oklahoma Department of Veterans Affairs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Veterans And Military Affairs: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1296 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019