OK HB1282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1282
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; engineering and land surveying; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; engineering and land surveying; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2017 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1282 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 475 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 12a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 12b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 12c | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 475 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |