OK HB1268 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying curricular requirements for mathematics; effective date.
Title
Schools; modifying curricular requirements for mathematics; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 10 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 10 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Laid over | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 55 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-15 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Coody | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 44 | |
2011-03-15 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-15 | Amended | |
2011-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-02 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |