OK HB1263 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1263
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; zero-emission facility tax credits; carryover; refundability; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; zero-emission facility tax credits; carryover; refundability; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1263 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019