OK HB1262 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for certain medical equipment; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for certain medical equipment; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-22Senate2 CCR adopted, GCCA
2019-05-20Senate2 CCR read, GCCA
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2019-05-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roe
2019-05-20House2 CCR adopted
2019-05-17House2 CCR submitted
2019-05-14SenateFurther conference granted, GCCA
2019-05-13HouseCCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
2019-05-09HouseEmergency restored
2019-05-09HouseTitle restored
2019-05-09HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Scott
2019-05-09HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, GCCA
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-09SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Tadlock
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-20HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-02-20HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseEmergency added
2019-02-14HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Hilbert
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1262&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1262%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1262%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1262%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1262%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1262%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1262%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1262%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1262%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1262%20CCS2.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1262%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1262_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1262_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback