OK HB1262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1262
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for certain medical equipment; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption for certain medical equipment; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 2 CCR read, GCCA |
2019-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2019-05-20 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2019-05-17 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Further conference granted, GCCA |
2019-05-13 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees |
2019-05-09 | House | Emergency restored |
2019-05-09 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Scott |
2019-05-09 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Tadlock |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | General Order |
2019-02-14 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-14 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2019-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1262 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019