OK HB1198 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1198
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; requiring signing of financial statements by certain officers; providing penalties; effective date.
Title
Public finance; requiring signing of financial statements by certain officers; providing penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] |
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 22 |
2019-03-04 | House | Amended |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, McEntire, West (Kevin), Echols |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1198 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee