OK HB1187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1187
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax incentive; sunset date; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax incentive; sunset date; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Died in conference |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2017-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Faught |
2017-02-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1187 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Died in conference