OK HB1162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1162
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Process servers; prohibiting certain persons from applying, reapplying or obtaining process server license; effective date.
Title
Process servers; prohibiting certain persons from applying, reapplying or obtaining process server license; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 33 |
2019-03-13 | House | Ayes: 60 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1162 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - SA's received