OK HB1157 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1157
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; providing health care providers shall choose method of reimbursement; effective date.
Title
Insurance; providing health care providers shall choose method of reimbursement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] |
Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard |
2019-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2019-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019