OK HB1157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; providing health care providers shall choose method of reimbursement; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; providing health care providers shall choose method of reimbursement; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2019
2019-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-22HouseSA's received
2019-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-17SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-17SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-12HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-11HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-11HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-03-11HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
2019-03-11HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-03-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
2019-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Marti
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Worthen
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1157&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1157%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1157%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1157%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1157%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1157%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1157%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1157%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1157_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1157_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback