OK HB1130 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; broadband equipment; modifying provisions of exemption; modifying reference; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions; broadband equipment; modifying provisions of exemption; modifying reference; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-08 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-08 | House | Amended |
2023-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-08 | House | General Order |
2023-02-14 | House | Emergency added |
2023-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1130 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Enacting clause restored