OK HB1063 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying source for Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying source for Self-insurance Guaranty Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire |
2019-03-04 | House | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1063 (Carry Over) 2019-04-10 - Title stricken