OK HB1052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; deleting time limitations for restricted, original and renewal driver licenses. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; deleting time limitations for restricted, original and renewal driver licenses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-18 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Terrill, Faught | |
2009-02-18 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Sears | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 121 | New Code | See Bill Text |