OK HB1044 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Roan, Walker
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-24 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Roan, Walker
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying residency requirement for city manager. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying residency requirement for city manager. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Roan, Walker | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2009-02-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Martin (Steve) | |
2009-02-10 | General Order | |
2009-02-04 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-04 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Sears | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |