OK HB1039 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax special event permits; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax special event permits; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Roberts (Dustin), Hoskin |
2013-02-27 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |