OK HB1038 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1038
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
Pending: Senate Appropriations Public Safety and Judiciary Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
Pending: Senate Appropriations Public Safety and Judiciary Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court reporters; modifying salary; effective date.
Title
Court reporters; modifying salary; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Walke |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1038 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary