OK HB1019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1019
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; diabetes treatment; insulin cost; effective date.
Title
Health insurance; diabetes treatment; insulin cost; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Forrest Bennett [D] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] |
Rep. Denise Brewer [D] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Grego |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Brewer |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Fugate, Bell, Roe |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1019 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021