OK HB1017 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; Polygraph Examiners Board; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Polygraph Examiners Board; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | House | Approved by Governor 05/04/2015 |
2015-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-28 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |