OK HB1013 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amusements and sports; state-tribal gaming; eliminating prohibition on certain types of gaming; requiring payment of funds by tribes in certain amounts; emergency.
Title
Amusements and sports; state-tribal gaming; eliminating prohibition on certain types of gaming; requiring payment of funds by tribes in certain amounts; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 27 |
2018-03-26 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2018-03-26 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-26 | House | General Order |
2018-03-26 | House | Withdrawn from Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Casey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |