OH SCR15 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the United States government to select Ohio to host the permanent headquarters of the United States Space Command.
Title
Locate US Space Command HQ in Ohio
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Informally passed |
2020-11-19 | House | Informally passed |
2020-11-19 | House | Reported: Economic and Workforce Development |
2020-08-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development |
2020-06-25 | House | Offered |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Offered |