OH SB57 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-18)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-18)
Status: Passed on October 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a one-year pilot project in Lorain County pursuant to which qualified emergency responders in that County may obtain and administer naloxone to revive a person suffering from an apparent opioid-related overdose.
Title
To establish a one-year pilot project in Lorain County pursuant to which qualified emergency responders in that County may obtain and administer naloxone to revive a person suffering from an apparent opioid-related overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-11 | Effective Date | |
2013-07-11 | Governor' Action | |
2013-07-19 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-07-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-06-27 | Concurrence | |
2013-05-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-15 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-27 | To Public Safety, Local Government & Veteran Affairs | |
2013-02-27 | Introduced to House | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-06-25 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-05-16 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-05-16 | Introduced to Senate |