OH SB44 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-08-22 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-08-22 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 5511.09 and 5589.081 of the Revised Code to permit local jurisdictions to request the Director of Transportation to designate a name for a bridge that is part of the highway system and to allow the use of retractable studded snow tires any time of year so long as the studs are not extended during prohibited times.
Title
Director of Transportation-name bridge on request
Sponsors
Rep. John Carey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-08-22 | Effective Date | |
2008-05-23 | Governor Action | |
2008-05-30 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-05-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-10-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-06-26 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-20 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2007-02-20 | Introduced to House | |
2008-05-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-04-24 | Committee Report | |
2007-10-10 | To Infrastructure, Homeland Security & Veterans Affairs | |
2007-10-10 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_44 |