OH SB322 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-01 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 505.49, 737.052, and 737.15 and to enact section 109.804 of the Revised Code to require the Ohio peace officer training commission to develop and conduct a chief of police training course for newly appointed chiefs of police appointed on or after January 1, 2017, and to require newly appointed chiefs of police of villages, cities, and townships to attend the training course within six months of appointment as a chief of police.
Title
Requires chiefs of police to complete training
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Hite [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Introduced |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Passed |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 09 | 804 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
5 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
5 | 05 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
7 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
7 | 37 | 052 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 37 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |