OH SB17 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2923.121, 2923.125, 2923.128, 2923.16, 2953.321, 2953.33, and 2953.35 and to enact section 2953.37 of the Revised Code to permit a concealed carry licensee to possess a firearm in a liquor permit premises, or an open air arena, for which a D permit has been issued if the licensee is not consuming beer or intoxicating liquor or under the influence of alcohol or a drug of abuse, to modify the offense of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle as it applies to concealed carry licensees, and to authorize the expungement of a prior conviction of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle that no longer would be a crime under the bill.
Title
To permit a concealed carry licensee to possess a firearm in a liquor permit premises, or an open air arena, for which a D permit has been issued if the licensee is not consuming beer or intoxicating liquor or under the influence of alcohol or a drug of abuse, to modify the offense of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle as it applies to concealed carry licensees, and to authorize the expungement of a prior conviction of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle that no longer would be a crime under the bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 56 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-06-15 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-30 | Governor' Action | |
2011-07-04 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-15 | Concurrence | |
2011-04-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-04-13 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-01 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-06-15 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-04-14 | To State Government & Elections | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 53 | 321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |