OH HCR6 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-25 - To Medicaid, Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Medicaid, Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States and the
Title
To urge the Congress of the United States and the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-04-25 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-04-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-04-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-27 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-02-27 | Introduced to House |